JESSICA BRADY CEDAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to improve GP awareness and diagnosis of cancer. Jessica Brady CEDAR Trust is working closely with the DHSC. Currently, we are funding an online teaching programme for General Practice doctors to help raise awareness and improve earlier diagnosis of cancer. This training module has been devised and created by the Royal College of General Practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Brady | Chair | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carl Westmoreland | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Aitken | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Brady | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sturgess | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO SUPPORT EARLIER DIAGNOSIS OF CANCER IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY IMPROVING AWARENESS AMONGST MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, IN GP SURGERIES, THROUGH TRAINING AND RESEARCH. [NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.].
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Holly Grove Road
Bramfield
Hertford
SG14 2QH
- Phone:
- 07392340572
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window