AGREE (ACKNOWLEDGE GIRLS RIGHT TO END EXPLOITATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Affifa Farrukh LLM PhD FRCP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Janusz Jankowski MD PhD FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Arifa Ramtoola | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor John Francis Mayberry DSc MD LLM FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH ON CHILD EMOTIONAL AND SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, COMMERCIAL SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AND CHILD SEX TRAFFICKING. THE RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VICTIMS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED CHILD SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, TRAFFICKING AND ABUSE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ‘PRO-BONO’ LEGAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Downing Drive
Evington
Leicester
LE5 6LL
LE5 6LL
- Phone:
- 07438186448
- Email:
- info@agree-charity.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window