RESTORED TO IGNITE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We ran a church and incorporate programs such as the Women Worship awards and also an outreach for albinos
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2023: CIO registration
- RESTORED TO IGNITE MINISTRY (COPY OF ORIGINAL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Samuel Yeboah Boafo | Chair | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Kessewa Bamfo | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mona Rebecca Vleyee | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68A NORBURY ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8JN
- Phone:
- 02087216675
- Email:
- RESTOREDTOIGNITE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window