Financial history BARNETBY LE WOLD RECREATIONAL FIELD

Charity number: 521892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.05k £9.35k £22.03k £25.39k £5.20k
Total expenditure £5.13k £8.01k £24.18k £25.49k £6.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £22.00k N/A N/A