UKRAINIAN ST MARY'S TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Satellite schools Family Support Enrichment Education Support Workers Project Choir Emotional/Psychological support Warm Space
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 July 2023: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S UKRAINIAN SCHOOL (Previous name)
- ST MARY'S UKRAINIAN SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inna Hryhorovych | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Vorokhib | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tejpal Kaur Barnes | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MYKOLA KOVAL | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ORYSYA NOVYTSKA | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAY 2023 as amended on 25 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF UKRAINE BY PROVIDING UKRAINIAN LANGUAGE CLASSES AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO EDUCATE AND ENGAGE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF UKRAINE. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN DISPLACED BY WAR IN UKRAINE AND GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UK, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SIGNPOSTING SERVICES, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
154 HOLLAND PARK AVENUE
LONDON
W11 4UH
- Phone:
- 02037954966
- Email:
- info@stmarysukrschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.