PROSPER OPERATIONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prosper contributes to sustainable economic development and poverty reduction in Sierra Leone. Our activities are designed to equip individuals with essential skills for business establishment and management, enhance their financial independence, and improve their overall economic status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 30 October 2023: Standard registration
- PROSPER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Mobed | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Olivia Rosemarie Hutchinson | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vijayalaxmi Ramachandran Underwood | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rory Copeland | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 FEB 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SIERRA LEONE AND OTHER COUNTRIES IN WEST AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN BOTH THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE SUBJECTS OF ENTREPRENEURSHIP AND GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4TH FLOOR
SILVERSTREAM HOUSE
45 FITZROY STREET
LONDON
W1T 6EB
- Phone:
- 07880616227
- Email:
- info@prosp-er.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window