SUDAN AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve and assist the victims of war, conflict or natural disaster, in particular by the provision of food, medical aid, accommodation, access to water and sanitation and other humanitarian assistance. The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship such as providing persons in need with grants or money or by providing or paying for services, items or facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Sudan
Governance
- 20 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SUAD SALIH AWAD | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr MOHAMED NASRELDIN MOHAMED | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Ghada Ahmed | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tamador Elhassan | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ahmed Mohamed Ali Elleithi | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hisham Salama | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruba Ali Ibrahim Mohamed | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT OR NATURAL DISASTER, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE. (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING PERSONS IN NEED WITH GRANTS OR MONEY OR BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR SERVICES, ITEMS OR FACILITIES. (3) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR FOR BUT LIMITED TO PEOPLE IN SUDAN AND SURROUNDING COUNTRIES AND REFUGEES OR SUDANESE ORIGIN IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 ROSEWOOD GARDENS
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 3DH
- Phone:
- 07791945402
- Email:
- mmnasreldin@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window