PLANT HEALTHY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Alliance is to promote and enhance plant health and biosecurity measures to protect plant species and associated ecosystems (natural capital) in the United Kingdom and beyond. The interests of the Alliance are represented by the charity Plant Healthy Ltd which is the owner of the Plant Health Management Standard and the Governing Body of the Plant Healthy Certification Scheme.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nicholas Hickman Ponsonby Bacon BT | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicola Jane Spence CBE | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geraint Richards | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Kentish-Barnes | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PLANT-LIFE AND BIODIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, INCLUDING BY INCREASING AWARENESS OF RESPONSIBLY GROWN AND PURCHASED PLANTS; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF PLANT DIVERSITY AND PROTECTION FROM PLANT PESTS AND DISEASES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESTATE OFFICE
RAVENINGHAM
NORWICH
NR14 6NS
- Phone:
- 01508548480
- Email:
- info@planthealthy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.