Financial history THE BURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521904
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £24.23k £34.03k £32.27k £18.86k £26.02k
Total expenditure £21.07k £29.15k £18.04k £38.31k £19.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.00k N/A N/A