Financial history CAISTOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.34k £12.80k £30.66k £31.03k £32.72k
Total expenditure £41.40k £10.44k £19.77k £21.38k £37.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.67k N/A N/A