KICK START FC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cunningham | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jayne Spanswick | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jessica Stapley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Vince Green | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Adonis Tingzon | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN WILTSHIRE, HAMPSHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 'FACILITIES' MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES). 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH USING THE MEDIUM OF FOOTBALL AND BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO WORKSHOPS AND DISCUSSIONS COVERING A RANGE OF TOPICS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO COPING STRATEGIES MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS AND SELF-CARE TECHNIQUES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kick Start FC
6 Central Street
Ludgershall
Andover
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 07887497560
- Email:
- kickstartfc@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window