IMMINGHAM DOGS HOME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue & rehome dogs in need from Lincolnshire and surrounding areas. We care and look after them until a permanent home is found no matter how long it takes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
olivia coles | Chair | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally lloyd | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KELLY MAGEE | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS IN LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, REHOMING SUCH DOGS WHERE POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
immingham dogs home
habrough rd
immingham boarding kennels
habrough rd
DN40 3QG
- Phone:
- 07808209434
- Email:
- kellyimmingham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.