EPWORTH WAR MEMORIAL FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities connected with the use of the Epworth Memorial Field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,935 from 2 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 January 1964: Standard registration
- EPWORTH WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PAUL HAIGH | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dudley-Wood | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES GLYNN | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTY HOLT | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER MACHIN | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Benson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATIE BLACKBURN | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Holt | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVE LEGGOTT | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CHRISTINA WALKER | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK THOMAS BRUMBY | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LOUISE WHITTAKER | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM BIRKS | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STUART TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY BACON | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CARYS LOUISE MCMAHON | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LAURA BACON | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.19k | £24.28k | £33.78k | £19.15k | £50.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.61k | £22.71k | £11.87k | £14.57k | £36.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.70k | £18.73k | £2.67k | £12.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 8 APRIL 1920, 6 FEBRUARY 1979 AND 23 FEBRUARY 1982.
Charitable objects
PUBLIC GROUND FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE RECREATION GROUNDS ACT 1859.
Area of benefit
EPWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Epworth War Memorial Field
Station Road
Epworth
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN9 1JU
- Phone:
- 000000000
- Email:
- thurlowpavilion@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window