REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD GREEN PASTURES PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We engage in religious activities and also some social action activities to benefit our community and the public in general. These activities are summarised in our Trustees Annual Returns and they are done in line with the bible and the doctrine of our denomination- The Redeemed Christian Church of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 May 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Akinwumi | Chair | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Josephine Oriakhi | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Joel | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Vincent Ibikunle | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Pastor Emmanuel Jones | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 APR 2023
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING CHURCHES, MINISTRIES, COMMUNITY CENTRES, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE, AND THE PROVISION OF LECTURES AND CONFERENCES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCCG GREEN PASTURES PARISH
101 JARROM STREET
LEICESTER
LE2 7DX
- Phone:
- 01163677225
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window