FOXTROT OSCAR CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sending Cancer patients and their family members to sporting events to create positive memories. Funds are raised through events and merchandise sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Heal | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Woodland | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Flory | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APR 2023 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND PEOPLE UNDERGOING CANCER TREATMENT OF ALL AGES, RACES & GENDERS BY FUNDING THE COST OF MEMORABLE DAYS OUT SUCH AS SPORTING OR MUSIC EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 FAIRWAY CLOSE
LIPHOOK
GU30 7XD
- Phone:
- 07808098944
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window