GAYTON-LE-MARSH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund raise through various social events to provide for the upkeep of the Village Hall and hire out the hall for others to use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 03 January 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANS MITCHELL | Chair | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carolanne Byers | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Kim Hollingsworth | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBINSON | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Jayne Wallace | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael John Wallace | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mykey Rockall | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MITCHELL | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £19.37k | £11.77k | £5.17k | £8.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £1.28k | £3.00k | £5.23k | £10.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.91k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 04 MAY 1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 JAN 1993 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GAYTON LE MARSH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GAYTON LE MARSH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westbrook
Main Street
Gayton Le Marsh
ALFORD
Lincolnshire
LN13 0NW
- Phone:
- 01507451184
- Email:
- jakedog1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window