Trustees GLENTWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andy Johnson Chair 18 May 2022
None on record
Emily Holland Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Peter Lazell Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Mike Belton Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Jane Bennett Pomeroy Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record
Fiona Catherine Hebborn Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Sadie Weller Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Carolyn Latham Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Karen Marjorie Doherty Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
RAY WARD Trustee
None on record
DAVID VAN DEN BOS Trustee
None on record