NORTH SURREY DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide information and advice to adults and children who have suffered or are exposed to domestic violence or other domestic abuse within the community in Epsom, Ewell, Elmbridge and Spelthorne.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Buttivant | Chair | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Alston | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neill Stacey | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rylance | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tania Bennett | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Gale | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Natasha Davidson | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Anne Kernick | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Bullen | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR OTHER DOMESTIC ABUSE BY PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND BY PROMOTING AWARENESS OF SUCH ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, WITHIN THE COMMUNITY IN EPSOM, EWELL, ELMBRIDGE AND SPELTHORNE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NSDAS
The Elmbridge Community Hub
72 High Street
Walton-on-Thames
KT12 1BU
- Phone:
- 01932260690
- Email:
- outreach@nsdas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window