SOUTH WALES AVIATION MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain an aviation museum with aircraft and memorabilia on display for the benefit of the public. To establish a conservation centre for repairs on aircraft parts and memorabilia for the benefit of the general public. To promote the aviation industry to children of a school leaving age by offering the practical experience required for a future career in the aviation industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,973 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 26 May 2023: CIO registration
- 13 June 2023: Funds received from 1184579 SOUTH WALES AVIATION MUSEUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Crocker | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayesh Parmar | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Spoors | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Hancock | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Rodd | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Sparks | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN AVIATION MUSEUM WITH AIRCRAFT AND MEMORABILIA ON DISPLAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ESTABLISH A CONSERVATION CENTRE FOR REPAIRS ON AIRCRAFT PARTS AND MEMORABILIA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. TO PROMOTE THE AVIATION INDUSTRY TO CHILDREN OF A SCHOOL LEAVING AGE BY OFFERING THE PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE REQUIRED FOR A FUTURE CAREER IN THE AVIATION INDUSTRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH WALES AVIATION MUSEUM
BRO TATHAN NORTH
ST. ATHAN
BARRY
CF62 4QR
- Phone:
- 01446788476
- Email:
- info@swam.museum
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window