THE PEOPLES PARK, GRIMSBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NATURE RESERVE PARK WITH ONE PLAY AREAS AND A CAFE AND EDUCATION ROOM. TWO TOILETS AND A CAR PARK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 January 1964: Standard registration
- PEOPLES PARK (Working name)
- PUBLIC PARK (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
North East Lincolnshire Council | Trustee | 01 April 1996 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.82k | £7.67k | £7.67k | £8.77k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.13k | £66.79k | £66.79k | £62.59k | £37.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 17TH AUGUST 1883, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 6 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
PEPOLES PARK AND OPEN PLEASURE GROUND FOR PUBLIC RESORT, RECREATION AND ENJOYMENT BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GREAT GRIMSBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUNICIPAL OFFICES
TOWN HALL SQUARE
GRIMSBY
N E LINCOLNSHIRE
DN31 1HU
- Phone:
- 01472313131
- Email:
- earling.dean@nelincs.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window