THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS ASHTON GATE BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bring the word of God to the congregation and wider community through services, pray groups, bible study, social events etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 29 June 2023: Standard registration
- ST FRANCIS PCC, ASHTON GATE BRISTOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Paul Allen | Chair | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Clash | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Howell Tyas | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Lane | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Josham | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Smith | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clark Frost | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Barrington Tooze | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANITA MAY MANNING | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
287 NORTH STREET
ASHTON GATE
BRISTOL
BS3 2AN
- Phone:
- 07443452448
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window