Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 521939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 20 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 April 2025 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 February 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 February 2024 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required