MAKING SOME NOISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-producing the design of spaces for older young people to connect, make friends and feel safe. Elevating the voices of lived experiences to shape strategies and services, relating to mental health and suicide prevention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2023: CIO registration
- MAKING SOME NOISE 4 MENTAL HEALTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Clark Miss | Chair | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Murray Clark Mr | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Rivett Mrs | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384 | |
|
Total expenditure | £669 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: I. PROVIDING INFORMATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO PROMOTE BETTER AWARENESS OF THE CAUSES OR TRIGGERS THAT CAN LEAD PEOPLE TO SUICIDE; II. CREATING BETTER UNDERSTANDING AND RECOGNITION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS’ MENTAL FITNESS, BY PROVIDING THOSE AFFECTED WITH AN OUTLET TO TELL THEIR STORIES AND EDUCATE OTHERS; III. WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH PUBLIC SERVICE PROVIDERS WHO MAY DEAL WITH PEOPLE AT RISK OF SUICIDE, AND THOSE DELIVERING MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bowshots
Cowfold Road
West Grinstead
RH13 8LY
- Phone:
- 07964133974
- Email:
- Makingsomenoise@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window