EAST DURHAM RUNNING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Durham Running Club (EDRC) offers running sessions, drills and skills sessions and Couch to 5km programmes in and around the East Durham Area of England. The club uses qualified Leaders in Running Fitness (LIRFS) and Coaches to deliver the sessions at different times of the day. EDRC caters for all abilities from complete beginners to experiences runners and has links to family fun sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £435 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 04 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Bridges | Chair | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Clapham | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kaye Stephenson | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Sara Jade Kirk - Saul | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Barker | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £435 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (3.1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE INHABITANTS OF EASINGTON COLLIERY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS; (3.2) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING: (1) OPPORTUNITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND RUNNING. (2) OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES CAPABLE OF IMPROVING FITNESS, HEALTH, AND WELLBEING; AND (3) COACHING, COMPETITION AND ALL OTHER SERVICES TO SUPPORT THESE ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARKLANDS
SEASIDE LANE SOUTH
PETERLEE
SR8 3PN
- Phone:
- 07972789012
- Email:
- Jill.bridges@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window