FISHERSGATE FLYERS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities, promote the game of Association Football, to arrange matches and social activities for its members and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 31 May 2023: CIO registration
- FISHERSGATE FLYERS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brent Pettit | Chair | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Lloyd | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Geoghegan | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Paul Chandler | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Joslin | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AND IN PARTICULAR FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF FOOTBALL, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN BRIGHTON & HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR AGE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 NORWAY STREET
PORTSLADE
BRIGHTON
BN41 1GN
- Phone:
- 07984970238
- Email:
- ffyfc.secretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window