SHARE HAYWARDS HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a 'Library of Things' for Haywards Heath and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Mallinson | Chair | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Mary Griffiths | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bronze | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Carpenter | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND SAFEGUARD THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HAYWARDS HEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE PROMOTION OF THE SHARING AND RE-USE OF PRODUCTS AS A MEANS OF PREVENTING AND MINIMISING WASTE DISPOSAL; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE SHARING AND RE-USE OF PRODUCTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SCOUTS HUT
EASTERN ROAD
LINDFIELD
RH16 2LP
- Phone:
- 07547771619
- Email:
- contactsharehh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
sharehh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window