THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the CIO are: the advancement of animal welfare by the relief of suffering and distress of Cairn Terriers through (but not limited to): supporting in the rescue of any Cairn Terrier in distress or who requires to be re-homed and where necessary providing boarding facilities and veterinary attention; supporting the adoption and future responsibility for Cairn Terriers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2023: CIO registration
- 10 December 2024: Funds received from 803599 THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE HEWITT | Chair | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gilyeat | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Francis | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Leisa Jane Stokel | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE BY THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CAIRN TERRIERS THROUGH (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1.1 SUPPORTING IN THE RESCUE OF ANY CAIRN TERRIER IN DISTRESS OR WHO REQUIRES TO BE RE-HOMED AND WHERE NECESSARY PROVIDING BOARDING FACILITIES AND VETERINARY ATTENTION; 3.1.2 SUPPORTING THE ADOPTION AND FUTURE RESPONSIBILITY FOR CAIRN TERRIERS ON SUCH CONDITIONS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES CONSIDER ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE INTERESTS OF SUCH ANIMALS; AND 3.1.3 PROMOTING THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF CAIRN TERRIERS AND ENCOURAGING IMPROVEMENTS IN THE CARE OF CAIRN TERRIERS. 3.2 IN CLAUSE 3.1, "CAIRN TERRIER" MEANS ANY DOG THAT IS FULL, PEDIGREE OR CROSS-BREED OF THE CAIRN TERRIER BREED. 3.3 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Cotherstone Close
CONSETT
DH8 7UE
- Phone:
- 01207658976
- Email:
- cairnrescueuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window