NETTLEHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a facility for local groups and individuals to meet for educational,recreational and sporting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 September 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Buttery | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Warner | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wright | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Seed | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Jenkinson | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kath Ersser | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Allison Faulkner | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Burkitt | Trustee | 01 February 2006 |
|
|
||||
TIM WHEELHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S CAIRNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.64k | £21.04k | £30.54k | £26.88k | £35.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.77k | £23.78k | £16.06k | £33.07k | £31.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £17.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 6 OCTOBER 1969 AND DEED OF RECTIFITCATION DATED 6TH MARCH 1970.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
NETTLEHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 SUTTON CLOSE
NETTLEHAM
LINCOLN
LN2 2XH
- Phone:
- 00000000000000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window