LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL FOLKESTONE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are primarily a family run business, non-judgemental, inclusive, open arms Pre-School. Catering for children from age 2 years until entering primary school. The pre-school's facilities and activities aim to enable children to gradually learn to become independent at their own pace, with good nutrition, play and rest. The objective is for them to become the best version of themselves
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 01 August 2023: CIO registration
- 13 May 2025: Funds received from 1088575 LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL (FOLKESTONE)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hudson | Chair | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Dunning | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Eve Claudina Neilly | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION, CARE FACILITIES AND FAMILY LEARNING WITH OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY. (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORIZE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Folkestone Baptist Church
Hill Road
Folkestone
CT19 6LY
- Phone:
- 01303245562
- Email:
- littleacorns13@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window