THE PIERCE PERSPECTIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pierce Perspective promotes mental health awareness and well-being through nature-based solutions and educational initiatives. We focus on community well-being gardens, mental health educational programs, men's mental health groups, and a dedicated podcast. Our work empowers individuals with knowledge, support, and a connection to nature, fostering a healthier society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE DRINKWATER | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DRINKWATER | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE STEWART | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD PIERCE | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482 | |
|
Total expenditure | £243 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY: (A) DELIVERING MENTAL HEALTH EDUCATION, SUPPORT, AND RESOURCES THROUGH PODCASTS, VIDEOS, WORKSHOPS, LIVE EVENTS, WRITTEN MATERIALS AND ONLINE PLATFORMS; (B) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE POSITIVE IMPACT UPON MENTAL HEALTH TO BE GAINED FROM PARTICIPATION IN THERAPEUTIC HORTICULTURE WHICH INCORPORATES THE USE OF ENVIRONMENTALLY CONSCIOUS PRACTICES; (C) PROVIDING OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS, INCLUDING THE OPPORTUNITY TO PARTICIPATE IN THERAPEUTIC HORTICULTURE PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Swains Green
Burbage
Hinckley
LE10 2QX
- Phone:
- 07970209283
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window