Trustees SUPPORTING HEALTHCARE HEROES UK

Charity number: 1205685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Alison Mary Twycross Chair 13 November 2023
None on record
Alexander Rosenbaum Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Adebola Abdulazeez Badiru Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Dolores Macchiavello Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Gerard Martin Bolger Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Maria Trewern Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Dr Michaela Catherine Barnard Trustee 13 November 2023
None on record