THE WATMOUGH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Saxilby Watmough Memorial Hall for the use by and benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 October 1967: Standard registration
- SAXILBY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth-'Jane' Dennett | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Baker | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Woollock | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronia Jocelyn Anne Williams | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hollinworth | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Holmes | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Rowett | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Freda Lowe | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.92k | £11.86k | £36.68k | £36.52k | £37.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.77k | £33.66k | £23.50k | £23.92k | £43.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.00k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 9TH NOVEMBER 1937 AS AUGMENTED BY A DEED DATED 31ST AUGUST 1944. SCHEME SEALED 19TH JULY, 1967.
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SAXILBY WITH INGLEBY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Sykes Lane
Saxilby
LINCOLN
LN1 2NS
- Phone:
- 07787564671
- Email:
- jane.dennettpt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window