ATTUNED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Attuned partners with individuals and schools to train teachers in applying neuroscience to optimise children's learning outcomes. We emphasise building strong community relationships and enhancing well-being in local communities, using principles of neuroscience.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- The Gambia
Governance
- 01 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tajana Manjoo | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erika Paule | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beata Diakowska | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juste Goek | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faizel Manjoo | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN AFRICA BY TRAINING TEACHERS AND OTHER ADULTS WORKING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE IN METHODS THAT ARE BASED ON NEUROSCIENCE, NEUROPLASTICITY, HEARTMATH AND NEUROLINGUISTIC PROGRAMMING (NLP).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
1 Heckfield Place
LONDON
SW6 5BF
- Phone:
- 07538180072
- Email:
- attuned.org@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.