HEART LINK CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support patients and families of children born with a congenital heart defect and come under the auspicies of the East Midlands Congenital Heart Centre, run by University Hospitals Leicester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Walter Smart MBE | Chair | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE RIGBY | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Ward | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Barnes | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Wayne Vincent Matts | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Marion Burgess | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Crowson | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Blay | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Anne McGurk | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme John Williams | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Angela Dilks | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Dilks | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Nicole Berry | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM HEART DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITIONS AND THOSE UNDER THE CARE OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS OF LEICESTER EAST MIDLANDS CONGENITAL HEART CENTRE AND/OR THOSE RECEIVING E.C.M.O (EXTRA CORPOREAL MEMBRANE OXYGENATION) TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 ROCKHILL DRIVE
MOUNTSORREL
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 7DT
- Phone:
- 01162106875
- Website:
-
heartlinkchildrenscharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window