ST JOHN'S SOUP KITCHEN AND FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of emergency food supplies and hot meals to the residents of the London Borough of Hackney and surrounding boroughs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 18 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Nina Szamuely | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMILY JANE LUCY FINCH | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Krishan Ryan Neelendra | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Susan Byrne | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Calum Douglas Docherty | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Matthew Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siu Man Alison Wong | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION ON A NON-REFERRAL BASIS OF HOT MEALS AND FOOD, HYGIENE AND HOUSEHOLD PROVISIONS, EMERGENCY CLOTHING AND MICRO-GRANTS FOR EMERGENCY LIVING EXPENSES AND BY OFFERING SIGNPOSTING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS VICARAGE
2A GLOUCESTER DRIVE
LONDON
N4 2LW
- Phone:
- 02088096111
- Email:
- chair@stjohnskitchen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window