BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1206042
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY IS AN AMATEUR CHOIR COMMITTED TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £38,134
Total expenditure: £29,162

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Antoinette Lank Chair 03 November 2021
BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Arne Johannes Plugge Trustee 27 September 2023
BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
John Christopher Steed Trustee 27 September 2023
BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Margaret Rose Fairbrother Trustee 28 September 2022
BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Stephen David Michael Potts Trustee 03 November 2021
HIGHGATE INTERNATIONAL CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
BRACKNELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

This is a recently registered charity and the chart shows the financial history since registration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2024
Total gross income £38.13k
Total expenditure £29.16k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
42 Jevington
BRACKNELL
RG12 7ZD
Phone:
07981860035