HAMILTON HALL

Charity Number: 521998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity manages and maintains a village hall. Enabling groups, clubs, individuals to have access to buildings and facilities at a reasonable cost.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,151
Total expenditure: £9,248

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katy Stark Chair 02 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £12.24k £5.17k £7.15k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £8.48k £9.75k £9.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2024 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2024 716 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 April 2023 813 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hamilton Hall
East Road
Tetford
HORNCASTLE
Lincolnshire
LN9 6QQ
Phone:
01507534455
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available