WIGAN PARENT CARER FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,785 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wigan
Governance
- 26 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Jane Aldred | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hooda Boyko | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Selby BSc, MSc | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF WIGAN PARENT CARER FORUM ARE TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND PARTICIPATION OF PARENT CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND/OR DISABILITIES (SEND) AGED 0-25 LIVING IN WIGAN BOROUGH IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF SERVICES PROVIDED FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEND. THE ORGANISATION AIMS TO EMPOWER PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEND AGED 0-25 AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING FORUMS, WORKSHOPS, INFORMATION, GENERAL SUPPORT, TRAINING, AND ACTIVITIES. IN ADDITION, WIGAN PARENT CARER FORUM AIMS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEND AND THEIR FAMILIES. OVERALL, THE ORGANISATION'S PRIMARY PURPOSES ARE TO REPRESENT THE VIEWS AND EXPERIENCES OF PARENTS AND CARERS OF DISABLED CHILDREN IN THEIR LOCAL AREA, TO IMPROVE ACCESS TO SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES WITH DISABLED CHILDREN, AND TO WORK WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ENHANCE LOCAL SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR THESE FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wigan Parent Carer Forum
ASHLAND HOUSE
DOBSON PARK WAY
INCE
WIGAN
WN2 2DX
- Phone:
- 07719330602
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window