NEW YORK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and maintain a meeting place in the village of New York for the use of residents in the village and surrounding area. Fund raising and social events are held and local clubs/societies and parish council use the hall for meetings etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 May 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Jayne Farrington | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marilyn Casey | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Lawes | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.53k | £25.30k | £16.29k | £9.74k | £18.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £17.88k | £13.25k | £16.78k | £13.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £468 | £19.91k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 28 DECEMBER 1967 as amended on 01 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
A VILLAGEHALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WILDMORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WILDMORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BUNGALOW
MILL LANE
NEW YORK
LINCOLN
LN4 4XQ
- Phone:
- 07931791927
- Email:
- janet.harrison@farming.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window