THE FRESSINGFIELD SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Shed open to all. We currently focus on Woodworking, Modelling, Crafts such as fabric work and Gardening. Although based in Fressingfield, Suffolk we encourage membership from surrounding villages too
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,198 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WOODWARD | Chair | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Kenneth Coe | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark King | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Laura Stein | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Christine Futter | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Scott Woodward | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MEN) AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN FRESSINGFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Goodwin Hall
New Street
Fressingfield
Eye
IP21 5PG
- Phone:
- 07887627558
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window