WEST BUTTERWICK CE PRIMARY ACADEMY PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our PTFA works together to create a school community of parents, teachers, pupils and others associated with West Butterwick CE Primary Academy. Together we fundraise to help provide all pupils with extra opportunities and experiences and to provide facilities and equipment which support the school and advance the education of all pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 21 June 2023: Standard registration
- WEST BUTTERWICK CE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Katie McGinley BSc Hons | Chair | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Callaghan | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Nile | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ballinger | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Easterbrook LLB, LLM | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Priest BA PGCE MA | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Baines | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Giles | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Melding BA Hons | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dickinson BSc Hons | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Callaghan | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £912 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 MAR 2023 as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST BUTTERWICK CE PRIMARY ACADEMY
SCHOOL LANE
WEST BUTTERWICK
SCUNTHORPE
DN17 3LB
- Phone:
- 01724783244
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window