Accounts and annual returns CAMBOIS MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522043
Charity reporting is overdue by 1593 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 132 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 132 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 499 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 499 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 864 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 864 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1229 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1229 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1593 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1593 days