RESTART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restart Foundation is focused on mental health services for Ukraine. We provide psychological support to children, veterans and civilians in Ukraine and promote good mental health practices and provide information to the general public. We also support mental health professionals working in Ukraine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Ukraine
Governance
- 10 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leonora Diana Meriel | Chair | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vafa Tahmazova | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alla Yansons | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoriia Goncharuk | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO: (A) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH; AND (B) RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE STRUGGLING WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ASSISTING UKRAINIAN PEOPLE, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) CHILDREN, REFUGEES AND VETERANS, TO RECOVER EMOTIONALLY, PSYCHOLOGICALLY AND PHYSICALLY FROM THE TRAUMA THEY HAVE EXPERIENCED AS A RESULT OF WAR, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPY AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 GROVE GARDENS
TEDDINGTON
TW11 8AP
- Phone:
- 07437013796
- Email:
- info@restart-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window