GLOBAL LIGHT APOSTOLIC MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Agnes Atato Olangi | Chair | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Eremwanarue | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PIERRE KATEHE MUNGOMBE | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Aol Otto | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205 | |
|
Total expenditure | £159 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Oct 2023 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DERBY AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE ENGLAND AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, BY PROMOTING SPIRITUAL GROWTH, SPREADING THE GOSPEL, EMPHASISING THE HOLY SPIRIT'S EMPOWERMENT, NURTURING VIBRANT WORSHIP, SUPPORTING COMMUNITY OUTREACH, PROVIDING SOUND BIBLICAL TEACHING, CREATING A WELCOMING ENVIRONMENT, ENCOURAGING DISCIPLESHIP AND MENTORING, PROMOTING FAMILY VALUES, AND CULTIVATING UNITY AND DIVERSITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED TO THIS CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Derby Urban church
Charnwood Str.
Derby
Derby Urban church
Charnwoo
- Phone:
- 07923214241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window