NELSON VILLAGE AND CRAMLINGTON MINERS' WELFARE AND COMMUNITY ORGANSIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES IS TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. THE CHARITY SEEKS TO ACHIEVE THIS THROUGH A RANGE OF SERVICES INCLUDING EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES, LEISURE AND SOCIAL WELFARE ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 06 December 1963: Standard registration
- NELSON COLLIERY INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- NELSON CRAMLINGTON MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PRINCE | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SLODLER | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FISH | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.59k | £19.09k | £22.81k | £20.11k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.55k | £14.25k | £9.46k | £19.30k | £17.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.32k | £17.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
I(1) THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS;
Area of benefit
NELSON, CRAMLINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
NELSON COLLIERY INSTITUTE AND
WELFARE ORGANISATION
53 NELSON AVENUE
NELSON VILLAGE
CRAMLINGTON
NORTHUMB
- Phone:
- 01670732982
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window