CRAMLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for the pursuit of social, leisure and education activities and is a charming space and is available for hire. We welcome regular local groups such as Art Groups, Carpet Bowls, Craft Groups, Dance Groups, Karate, Tai Chi, Toddler Groups, Spiritual Groups, Yoga, private parties, community events, celebrations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 March 1968: Standard registration
- CRAMLINGTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Davies | Chair | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Owens | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Davies | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Norman Henderson | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Graham Blair | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.37k | £17.15k | £11.90k | £19.84k | £20.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.08k | £8.65k | £10.43k | £21.60k | £19.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.43k | N/A | £6.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
CRAMLINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cramlington Community Centre
East Farm Terrace
CRAMLINGTON
Northumberland
NE23 1DT
- Phone:
- 01670713000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window