BURGESS HILL CREATIVE COMMUNITY (BHCC)

Charity number: 1203629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Creative Arts and Craft Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £28,310
Total expenditure: £9,451

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Homan Chair 19 June 2023
None on record
Geraldine Mary Gasson Trustee 31 January 2025
None on record
Peter Nicholas Crabtree Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Isobel Woods Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Stephanie Goldfinch Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2024
Total gross income £28.31k
Total expenditure £9.45k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30-32 THE MARTLETS
BURGESS HILL
RH15 9NN
Phone:
07958595685