DALTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the Village Hall to the necessary standard so that it may be used safely for Community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £1,580 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian McCowie | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate McCabe | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter McCowie | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Hartford | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MALCOLM ERRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.41k | £6.94k | £14.08k | £25.66k | £53.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.02k | £3.79k | £7.72k | £21.74k | £55.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | N/A | £1.50k | £4.56k | £1.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF EXCHANGE AND DEED OF TRUST DATED 7TH MAY 1964
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIPS OF DALTON, EACHWICK, NORTH AND SOUTH DISSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Longmeadows
Prospect Farm
The Avenue
MEDBURN
Northumberland
NE20 0JD
- Phone:
- 07909524046
- Email:
- peter@mccowie.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window