SAINTS SLED DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Non profit charity dedicated to rescuing and rehoming Sled dogs around the UK. We operate using foster homes country wide helping Sled dogs find their happily ever after.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 2023: Standard registration
- 16 May 2025: Funds received from 1179637 SAINTS SLED DOG RESCUE
- SSDR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER SAVILLE | Chair | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Simpson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damion Burbridge | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE BATEMAN | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR SIBERIAN HUSKIES AND ALASKAN MALAMUTES BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR SUCH DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE WELFARE OF SIBERIAN HUSKIES AND ALASKAN MALAMUTES IN PARTICULAR, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mahon House
Garmondsway
FERRYHILL
County Durham
DL17 9DY
- Phone:
- 07983548370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window