GOSFORTH GARDEN VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a site for local people, with an all-year Tennis Club, a Bowling Club, four small allotments and the Garden Village Hall, opened in June 2012. It serves our sports clubs and W.I. It is used for exercise and recreation (e.g. Keep Fit, Tai Chi, and Yoga) and for meetings. It is also available for hire for children's parties and private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 18 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Christopher Jobe | Chair | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graham Vickers | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Gary Maughan | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Raymond Fisk | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margery Lyons | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.56k | £15.97k | £15.97k | £28.76k | £23.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.36k | £11.95k | £11.95k | £24.39k | £26.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £480 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.80k | £12.69k | £12.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 10TH APRIL 1959 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE
Area of benefit
GOSFORTH GARDEN VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gosforth Garden Village Association
6 Rosewood Avenue
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 5DD
- Phone:
- 07779331761
- Email:
- chair@ggva.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window